DS-Concept Trade Invest, LLC v. Gourmet Food Imports, LLC et al

Plaintiff: DS-Concept Trade Invest, LLC
Defendant: Gourmet Food Imports, LLC and Gormet Food Imports Ltd
Case Number: 3:2016cv00466
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for 4/22/2016 is CONTINUED to 5/20/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/20/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
March 16, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 19 Proposed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Gourmet Food Imports, LLC. J. Edward Brooks is counsel of record for Defendant Gourmet Food Imports, LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/16/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 1, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 6 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DS-Concept Trade Invest, LLC v. Gourmet Food Imports, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DS-Concept Trade Invest, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gourmet Food Imports, LLC
Represented By: John Edward Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gormet Food Imports Ltd
Represented By: John Edward Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?