Wagda v. Town of Danville et al

Plaintiff: Donald Cloyce Wagda
Defendant: Town of Danville, Town of Danville Police Department, County of Contra Costa, Office of the Sheriff of County of Contra Costa, David O. Livingston, Steve Simpkins, Mike Jiminez, Emily Neabeack, Tyler Nelson, Thomas Rossberg, Steve Stapleton and Michael Gray
Case Number: 3:2016cv00488
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Wagda's Second Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than June 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/26/17. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 9, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. The initial case management conference shall be set for June 23, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 7, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. The initial Case Management Conference shall be set for May 19, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/7/17. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
March 9, 2017 122 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/9/17. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
January 27, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Defendants shall file their Supplemental Brief within two days of this Order. Plaintiff shall have leave to file a brief no more than two pages in length in opposition to the Supplemental Brief within seven days of the filing of the Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/27/17. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 25, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. The hearing scheduled for January 27, 2017 is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/25/17. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
November 1, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR-RELATED DATES. The initial case management conference is continued from December 2, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. to February 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/1/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 24, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 51 ; GRANTING STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 67 ; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONVERT 53 . Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than November 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/24/2016. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
July 28, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR-RELATED DATES. The Court continues the initial Case Management Conference from August 26, 2016, to December 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/28/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
June 14, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO CONVERT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/14/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 19, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONVERT. The hearing on the County Defendants' motion to dismiss and on plaintiff's motion to convert are continued to June 17, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 12, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 12, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 9, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/9/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagda v. Town of Danville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cloyce Wagda
Represented By: Donald Cloyce Wagda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Danville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Danville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Sheriff of County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Jiminez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Neabeack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Rossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?