Perez v. TransitAmerica Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kerry Perez
Defendant: TransitAmerica Services, Inc., UMR, Inc. and Railway Claims Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00489
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER THEREON by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
April 22, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. TransitAmerica Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransitAmerica Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railway Claims Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Perez
Represented By: George S. Duesdieker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?