Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. K.O.O. Construction, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: K.O.O. Construction, Inc., and Keith Odister
Case Number: 3:2016cv00518
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 133 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Attachment issued in the amount of $2,743,193.81 to K.O.O. Construction Inc. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 88 Motion to Amend Attachment Order; denying 98 Motion to Intervene. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
December 16, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 59 Motion for Attachment. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
June 22, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 42 Request for Telephonic Appearance at Case Management Conference/ Proposed Order filed by Keith Odister, K.O.O. Construction, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C Spero on 6/22/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 27 Proposed Order filed by Keith Odister, K.O.O. Construction, Inc., for Arthur G. Woodward to appear by phone on 4/29/16 at 2:00 PM. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. K.O.O. Construction, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Andrew Garth Guess
Represented By: Michael James Timpane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.O.O. Construction, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Odister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?