Gosal v. Save Mart Supermarkets et al

Plaintiff: Mandeep Gosal
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets, Zeke Lozano and Kent Lafferty
Case Number: 3:2016cv00601
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 38 Motion to Dismiss; deferring ruling on 39 Motion to Strike ; denying 46 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 15, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/15/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
September 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer terminating 22 Motion to Strike and Granting Leave to Amend. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gosal v. Save Mart Supermarkets et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeke Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandeep Gosal
Represented By: Jason M. Erlich
Represented By: Paul Kenneth Pfeilschiefter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?