Delphix Corp. v. Embarcadero Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Delphix Corp.
Defendant: Embarcadero Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00606
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DISMISSING THE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/25/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 17, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 36 , 37 MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
June 2, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 28 Case Management Conference - Initial, Case Management Statement due by 08/04/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2016 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/02/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delphix Corp. v. Embarcadero Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphix Corp.
Represented By: Eric J. Ball
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embarcadero Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?