Artemus et al v. Louie et al

Plaintiff: William Artemus and United States
Defendant: Jim Yan Louie and Christine Nian Louie
Case Number: 3:2016cv00626
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 41 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Relator is required to E-FILE the amended document. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
December 21, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ADMISSIONS AND FOR PERMISSION TO SERVE TARDY RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/21/2016.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
September 2, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1. Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.Jury Selection set for 12/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2017 to 12/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/2/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
May 5, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION AND ORDER TO UNSEAL. Signed by Judge Jacqueline S. Corley on 5/5/16. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artemus et al v. Louie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Artemus
Represented By: Jason A Hain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Yan Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Nian Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?