Patrick Ferry v. De'Longhi America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Patrick Ferry, Brenda Gonzales, Lola Hibbs, Larry Sapp, Don Sapp and Sharon Cornelius
Defendant: De'Longhi America, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00659
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 58 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Plaintiff Patrick Ferry's Wrongful Death Claim.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
January 12, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MEET AND CONFER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL. Discovery Hearing(Lead trial counsel meet and confer), set for 1/20/2017 09:15 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/12/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
May 25, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
February 26, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2016. Initial Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2016 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/26/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 23, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Ferry v. De'Longhi America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De'Longhi America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie B. Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas Edward Healy
Represented By: James William Hunt
Represented By: Rudolph Victor Pino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Alyce Winn Foshee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ferry
Represented By: Walter Alexander Haynes, IV
Represented By: Albert Gustav Stoll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Gonzales
Represented By: Walter Alexander Haynes, IV
Represented By: Albert Gustav Stoll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola Hibbs
Represented By: Walter Alexander Haynes, IV
Represented By: Albert Gustav Stoll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Sapp
Represented By: Walter Alexander Haynes, IV
Represented By: Albert Gustav Stoll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Sapp
Represented By: Walter Alexander Haynes, IV
Represented By: Albert Gustav Stoll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Cornelius
Represented By: Walter Alexander Haynes, IV
Represented By: Albert Gustav Stoll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?