Moralez v. Tehrani

Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Defendant: Robeheba Tehrani and Real Holdings, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv00665
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/29/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 20, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 38 Motion to Continue. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/29/2017 11:00 AM.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 6, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSING DEFENDANTS REAL HOLDINGS, INC., ROBEHERBA TEHRANI, AND BILL BINDAL re 36 Certificate of Service filed by Francisca Moralez, 35 Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/22/2017 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/6/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
May 26, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PROOF OF SERVICE Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/26/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 24, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 28 Report and Recommendations..(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
December 1, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO OBJECT TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
July 12, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING ADDITIONAL TIME FOR JOINT SITE INSPECTION: Re 17 Request filed by Francisca Moralez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/12/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moralez v. Tehrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robeheba Tehrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?