William Silverstein v. Keynetics Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William Silverstein
Defendant: Keynetics Inc., Click Sales Inc. and 418 Media LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00684
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part 55 Motion to Dismiss, granting in part 57 Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing Plaintiff's second amended complaint with prejudice. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
June 27, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 8/31/2016 at 1:30 p.m. Joint CMC statement due by 8/24/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
April 7, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 6 , 13 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/07/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 24, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 28 Motion to Continue, 30 Motion for Joinder.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Silverstein v. Keynetics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keynetics Inc.
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Represented By: Sapna S. Mehta
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Click Sales Inc.
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Represented By: Sapna S. Mehta
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 418 Media LLC
Represented By: Kavon Adli
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Silverstein
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr.
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?