Brickman v. Facebook, Inc.

Plaintiff: Colin R. Brickman
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00751
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 84 Facebook's Motion to Certify Court's 78 Order Denying Facebook's Motion to Dismiss for Interlocutory Appeal and Staying Case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/27/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 50 Facebook's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/27/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
November 10, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing, Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and Continuing Case Management Conference. Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 11/21/2016. Response due by 11/28/2016. Motion Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/10/2016. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
September 27, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating and Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/27/16.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
July 25, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FACEBOOK'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 47 Proposed Order filed by Colin R. Brickman. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/21/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 11, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case ressigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Hon. Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/11/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 6, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/6/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
May 5, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING UNTIL AFTER A RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for May 20, 2016, shall be adjourned and rescheduled for October 14, 2016; and the deadline for the Joint Case Management Statement shall be rescheduled for September 30, 3016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 3, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 29, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant is directed to file, no later than May 6, 2016, the requisite certificate of service. The Court se ts the following schedule on the motion to dismiss: 1. If the United States wishes to intervene for the purpose of opposing defendant's motion, it shall do so and file its opposition no later than July 8, 2016. 2. Plaintiff shall file his oppo sition no later than July 8, 2016. 3. Defendant shall file any reply no later than July 15, 2016. 4. The hearing on the motion is continued to July 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 15, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF DEVIN SCOTT ANDERSON PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
March 25, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 25, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 11, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ANDREW B. CLUBOK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brickman v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin R. Brickman
Represented By: Frank A. Bartela
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Represented By: Martin Daniel Quinones
Represented By: Kristen Law Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?