Zee Apparel, Inc. v. RealReal, Inc.

Plaintiff: Zee Apparel, Inc.
Defendant: RealReal, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00755
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED JUDGMENT re Docket No. 89 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/11/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
December 8, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 45 and 46 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. The parties shall file documents as described herein no later than December 15, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
October 11, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
August 5, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation for Protective Order For Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information And/Or Trade Secrets. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
May 24, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2017 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/24/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zee Apparel, Inc. v. RealReal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zee Apparel, Inc.
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Michael Alan Trauben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealReal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Represented By: Ezekiel Lee Rauscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?