International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269 v. YP Advertising and Publishing, LLC

Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269
Defendant: YP Advertising and Publishing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00767
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 18, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 17, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING as to 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 10:00 a.m. 2/19/2016. Replies due by 10:00 a.m. 2/23/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269 v. YP Advertising and Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269
Represented By: Andrew H. Baker
Represented By: Dalisai Sheri Nisperos
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YP Advertising and Publishing, LLC
Represented By: Melanie Marie Campili Cole
Represented By: Paul Edward Goatley
Represented By: John M. Skonberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?