Baker v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Lena Baker
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv00771
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 for Equal Access to Justice Fees filed by Lena Baker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
October 7, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 17 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and Remanding Case. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
August 16, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Baker
Represented By: Daniel Leo Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?