David Leverage et al v. Traeger Pellet Grills, LLC et al

Plaintiff: David Leverage and Michael Lentini
Defendant: Traeger Pellet Grills, LLC and Xen 2, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00784
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 74 Motion for Preliminary Approval. Motion for Final Approval due by 10/12/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
May 2, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Supplemental Briefing on 74 MOTION for Preliminary Approval. Supplemental briefing due by May 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/2/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
May 10, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/10/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Leverage et al v. Traeger Pellet Grills, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Leverage
Represented By: John Henry Crouch, IV
Represented By: Christine A Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lentini
Represented By: John Henry Crouch, IV
Represented By: Christine A Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traeger Pellet Grills, LLC
Represented By: David Peter Fuad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xen 2, Inc.
Represented By: David Peter Fuad
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?