Charles E White et al v. Chevron Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Charles E White, Jr., John P. Jacobs, Verlan D. Hoopes, Nora L. Pennington, James A. Ray and Jeannette A. Finley
Defendant: Chevron Corporation and Chevron Investment Committee
Case Number: 3:2016cv00793
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 44 Motion to Dismiss; granting 51 Motion to Strike ; terminating 58 Motion for Leave to File; terminating 61 Motion for Leave to File. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 27 Motion to Dismiss. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2016 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/9/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles E White et al v. Chevron Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Catalina Joos Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Investment Committee
Represented By: Catalina Joos Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E White, Jr.
Represented By: Troy Andrew Doles
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Represented By: Michael Armin Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Jacobs
Represented By: Troy Andrew Doles
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Represented By: Michael Armin Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlan D. Hoopes
Represented By: Troy Andrew Doles
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Represented By: Michael Armin Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora L. Pennington
Represented By: Troy Andrew Doles
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Represented By: Michael Armin Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Ray
Represented By: Troy Andrew Doles
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Represented By: Michael Armin Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette A. Finley
Represented By: Troy Andrew Doles
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Represented By: Michael Armin Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?