Whitsitt v. Tesla Motors Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William J. Whitsitt
Defendant: Telsa Motors, M.B.H.R. Rep. Telsa Motors, Inc. and West Valley Staffing Group
Case Number: 3:2016cv00797
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT TESLA MOTORS, INC.'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER GRANTING REINSTATEMENT OF CASES. The hearing is continued from June 2, 2017, to June 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/26/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 4, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT; RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled for May 5, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/04/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
March 29, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
February 7, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 3/10/17. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than 3/3/17. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
September 30, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO MANUALLY SERVE PRO SE PLAINTIFF; SETTING SERVICE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE; CONTINUING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Tesla must manually serve plaintiff by October 4, 2016 and file proof of such service with in 4 days of effectuating service. Plaintiff's opposition to Tesla's motion to dismiss must be filed and served by October 21, 2016. Tesla's reply, if any, must be filed and served by October 28, 2016. The hearing on Tesla's motion to dismiss is continued to November 18, 2016. The case management conference is continued to February 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/30/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitsitt v. Tesla Motors Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Whitsitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telsa Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B.H.R. Rep. Telsa Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley Staffing Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?