Fortune Players Group, Inc. et al v. Quint, Jr. et al

Plaintiff: Fortune Players Group, Inc., Angelita De Los Reyes and Vanessa Parungao
Defendant: Wayne Quint, Jr., Yolanda Sanchez, Aaron Wong, Michael Fanucchi, Mark Legarejos, Micah Scott, Steve Norris, Holly Kinney and Rochelle Shadwick
Case Number: 3:2016cv00800
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Non-party DFEH's Motion for Limited Intervention, Abstention and Dismissal. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/19/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
October 17, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/17/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
August 2, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
June 30, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Statement (preferably joint) not to exceed 5 pages, due by 07/18/16. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 06/30/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
May 9, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR MONETARY DAMAGES re 18 Stipulation filed by Fortune Players Group, Inc., Vanessa Parungao, Angelita De Los Reyes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/9/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
February 24, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/24/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortune Players Group, Inc. et al v. Quint, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortune Players Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Gearinger
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelita De Los Reyes
Represented By: Brian Gearinger
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Parungao
Represented By: Brian Gearinger
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Quint, Jr.
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Sanchez
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Wong
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fanucchi
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Legarejos
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Scott
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Norris
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Kinney
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Shadwick
Represented By: Sara J Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?