Wells Fargo v Aaron

Respondent: Wanda Maxine Aaron
Movant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 3:2016cv00802
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/29/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 24, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Related Case Order (In re Aaron) . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/24/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 23, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED re 15-2951. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/23/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo v Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wanda Maxine Aaron
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Bernard Jaron Kornberg
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Rebecca Snavely Saelao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?