Bell v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Bell
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv00809
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
October 13, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Plaintiff shall have an extension until November 11, 2016 to file a reply to defendant's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/13/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
August 26, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant shall have an extension of time of 30 days, until September 28, 2016, to file a response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 26, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
July 26, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
February 23, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Bell
Represented By: William David Namnath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Heather M Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?