Tolbert v. City & County of San Francisco Department of Public Health et al

Plaintiff: Kim E. Tolbert
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco Department of Public Health and Barbara Garcia
Case Number: 3:2016cv00810
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/11/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 27, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato permitting conditional withdrawal of counsel re 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court terminates 33 Motion to Shorten Time. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 3, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 26 Stipulation re extension of deadlines. The amended complaint will be filed by July 13, 2016. The case management conference is continued to July 20, 2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 6, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato re 13 , 14 Motions to Dismiss. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolbert v. City & County of San Francisco Department of Public Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim E. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco Department of Public Health
Represented By: Trevor John Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Garcia
Represented By: Trevor John Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?