Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Ranger Pipelines, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Ranger Pipelines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00815
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal. Telephone Conference set for 12/6/2016 03:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
August 30, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
June 1, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
March 22, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Re 12 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/22/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
February 23, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Hon. William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Ranger Pipelines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Kimberly Rene Arnal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranger Pipelines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?