Arch Insurance Company v. Fahmy et al

Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Defendant: Sarwat L Fahmy and Fahmy Law Group
Case Number: 3:2016cv00819
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
June 8, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 7/15/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 6, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/6/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court having considered the parties' respective written submissions and the arguments of counsel, and for the reasons stated by the Court on the record at the hearing, the Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 6, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
March 2, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CHAMBERS COPIES. As to all documents filed hereafter in the instant case, the parties are directed to submit chambers copies in single-sided format. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arch Insurance Company v. Fahmy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarwat L Fahmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fahmy Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Kyung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?