Tongarm v. Vizio, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Caroline Tongarm
Defendant: Vizio, Inc. and Cognitive Media Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00822
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Central District of California. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
March 15, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceeding.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 1, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Lynch, Gary.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 23, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tongarm v. Vizio, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Tongarm
Represented By: Joyce Chang
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vizio, Inc.
Represented By: Hyongsoon Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cognitive Media Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Hyongsoon Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?