CAMOFI MASTER LDC et al v. Associated Third Party Administrators et al

Plaintiff: CAMOFI MASTER LDC and CAMHZN MASTER LDC
Defendant: Associated Third Party Administrators, DIANE GIST, JESSE M KESSLER, MED-TECH HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, Richard E. Stierwalt and United Benefits and Pension Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00855
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 Regarding Further Temporary Stay of Litigation in Light of Bankruptcy Automatic Stay filed by CAMOFI Master LDC, CAMHZN Master LDC. Status Report due by 5/18/2017. Status Conference reset for 5/25/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
November 21, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 79 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 7, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE filed by CAMOFI Master LDC, CAMHZN Master LDC. Discovery due by 6/2/2017. Status Report due by 1/12/2017. Dispositive Motion Hearing reset for 8/3/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/7/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
September 23, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 Stipulation, filed by Med-Tech Health Solutions, LLC, Jesse M Kessler. Motion reset for Tuesday 10/18/16 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
June 27, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO EXCHANGE INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Associated Third Party Administrators. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 16, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 26 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
April 19, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Defendants' Request for an Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/19/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMOFI MASTER LDC et al v. Associated Third Party Administrators et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMOFI MASTER LDC
Represented By: William Ross Warne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMHZN MASTER LDC
Represented By: William Ross Warne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Third Party Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE GIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSE M KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MED-TECH HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Stierwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Benefits and Pension Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?