Dallas Buyers Club LLC v. DOE-73.202.228.252

Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club LLC
Defendant: DOE-73.202.228.252
Case Number: 3:2016cv00858
Filed: February 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXPEDITE DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal issuing Proposed Order at 14 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 23, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 4 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
February 29, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO RELATE CASE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 6 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dallas Buyers Club LLC v. DOE-73.202.228.252
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club LLC
Represented By: James Stephen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE-73.202.228.252
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?