Dallas Buyers Club LLC v. DOE-73.170.32.155

Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club LLC
Defendant: DOE-73.170.32.155
Case Number: 3:2016cv00859
Filed: February 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Directing Plaintiff to File Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/19/16. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
April 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Approving Proposed Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/28/16. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 5 Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery and Denying as Moot 17 Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dallas Buyers Club LLC v. DOE-73.170.32.155
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club LLC
Represented By: James Stephen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE-73.170.32.155
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?