Muse v. California State University East Bay et al

Plaintiff: Rochelle M. Muse
Defendant: California State University East Bay and California State University East Bay Police Department
Case Number: 3:2016cv00867
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 2/10/2017 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2017. Further Cases Management Conference set for Monday, 1/30/2017 is CONTINUED to Monday, 2/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/25/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
October 7, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
June 2, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/2/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muse v. California State University East Bay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle M. Muse
Represented By: Vicki E Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State University East Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State University East Bay Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?