Sequoia Sales, Inc. v. Lim's Produce, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sequoia Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Lim's Produce, Inc. and Marc Lim
Case Number: 3:2016cv00878
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 63 Case Management Statement & Request for Continuance filed by Chick's Produce, Inc., Del Fresh Produce, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2016. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 8/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/12/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
May 31, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 55 Letter filed by Chick's Produce, Inc., Del Fresh Produce, Inc., for Patricia Rynn to appear by phone on 7/15/16 at 2:00 PM . Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/31/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 10, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 Letter filed by Sequoia Sales, Inc., for Kaipo Young to appear by phone on 5/13/16 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/10/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 29, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 21 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, issuing TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR MAY 13, 2016 at 2:00 P.M. Lim's Produce's response to OSC due May 4, 2016. Intervenor Plaintiffs' Reply due May 9, 2016. Joint Case Management Statement due May 6, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequoia Sales, Inc. v. Lim's Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoia Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Kaipo K.B. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lim's Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Charles Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Lim
Represented By: Derek Charles Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?