Mikhak v. University of Phoenix

Plaintiff: Bahar Mikhak
Defendant: University of Phoenix
Case Number: 3:2016cv00901
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 14 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 24, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE JUNE 17, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by University of Phoenix. Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/15/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/20/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 10, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting: 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY MOTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Bahar Mikhak. Reset Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss This Action Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6), Or In The Alternative, Stay the Proceedings. Responses due by 5/20/2016. Replies due by 6/3/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/6/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikhak v. University of Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahar Mikhak
Represented By: William Clarence McNeill, III
Represented By: Howard Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Noah Asa Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?