Moeller v. Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company

Plaintiff: Kevin Moeller
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00910
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 43 Stipulation of Dismissal of action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/4/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
November 21, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME AND SETTING CONFERENCE CALL RE STATUS re 39 Stipulation, filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Status Conference by telephone is set for Friday, 12/2/2016 09:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/21/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
September 27, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2016 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 12/13/2016 02:00 PM, the same date as the Defendants' proposed motion for summary judgment would be heard, if filed, in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/27/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
July 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING DEADLINE FOR PRIVATE MEDIATION; SETTING DEADLINE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: CLASSIFICATION ISSUE re 27 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Kevin Moeller, Lockheed Martin Corporation, OR DER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR: Private Mediation to be completed by 9/30/16. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2016 02:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/19/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moeller v. Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Moeller
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Represented By: David C. Lipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?