Global Quality Foods, Inc. v. Van Hoekelen Greenhouses, Inc.

Plaintiff: Global Quality Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Van Hoekelen Greenhouses, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv00920
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT OF GLOBAL QUALITY FOODS, INC., WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/14/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
August 12, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. Under the doctrine of forum non conveniens, the court dismisses van Hoekelen's third-party complaint [ECF No. 17] against Total Quality Logistics without prejudice. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 1, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER --- As the attached order discusses, the court just noted that third-party defendant Total Quality Logistics did not file a signed consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction. Any party is free to withhold consent without substantive consequenc es. This obviously poses an issue with the pending hearing on August 4. If Total Quality Logistics files its consent by tomorrow, August 2, the court will be able to address the motion on August 4. Alternatively, counsel may need time to consult with the client. If that is so, then the court would continue the hearing for a week (or to any subsequent Thursday that is convenient for counsel). Either way, the court asks Total Quality Logistics to either file its consent or declination or update the court about its timeline by 5:30 p.m. on August 2. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/1/2016. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Quality Foods, Inc. v. Van Hoekelen Greenhouses, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Quality Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Ivo Michael Labar
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Hoekelen Greenhouses, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?