Papst Licensing GmbH & Co. KG v. Xilinx Inc.

Plaintiff: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co. KG
Defendant: Xilinx Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv00925
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 102 Motion for Attorney Fees. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
July 28, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying as moot 108 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; granting 109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
June 9, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (81) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in case 5:16-cv-00926-LHK; granting (88) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in case 5:16-cv-00925-LHK. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co. KG v. Xilinx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Andrew G. DiNovo
Represented By: Jay D Ellwanger
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Gabriel Gervey
Represented By: Nicole E. Glauser
Represented By: Daniel L. Schmid
Represented By: William Paul Schuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xilinx Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Jason M. Gonder
Represented By: Justin Morteza Lee
Represented By: Joe C. Liu
Represented By: Joe Chuan-Che Liu
Represented By: Karen Jacobs Louden
Represented By: Patrick T. Michael
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Michael
Represented By: Matthew James Silveira
Represented By: Henry L. Welch
Represented By: Glenn E. Westreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?