Forsyth v. Motion Picture Association of America (MPAA) et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Forsyth
Defendant: Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., The Walt Disney Company, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal City Studios LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. and National Association of Theatre Owners
Case Number: 3:2016cv00935
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER 75 RE (1) DEFENDANT NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF THEATRE OWNERS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, AND (2) HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER re National Association of Theatre Owners' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Hearing Date for Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Defendant NATO Motion For Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER 60 re Entry of Judgment and Defendants' Deadline to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/28/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/10/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Defendants' Reply in support of special motion to strike plaintiffs' action pursuant to California's Anti-Slapp statute and motion to dismiss, and hearing date for special motion to strike. Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE [#39]. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forsyth v. Motion Picture Association of America (MPAA) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Forsyth
Represented By: Carey Gavin Been
Represented By: Sarah R. Holloway
Represented By: John G. Jacobs
Represented By: Jeffrey Farley Keller
Represented By: Bryan G. Kolton
Represented By: David Schachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Picture Association of America, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Isaac Kaplan
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Glenn D Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Adam Isaac Kaplan
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Glenn D Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Adam Isaac Kaplan
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Glenn D Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Adam Isaac Kaplan
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Glenn D Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Adam Isaac Kaplan
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Glenn D Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal City Studios LLC
Represented By: Adam Isaac Kaplan
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Glenn D Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Adam Isaac Kaplan
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Represented By: Achyut Jayant Phadke
Represented By: Glenn D Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Theatre Owners
Represented By: Kenneth L Marshall
Represented By: Alexandra Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?