Louie v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: Choy Wah Louie
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00939
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation TO CONTINUE TIME TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
June 2, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Stipulation Re Revised Case Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 17, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louie v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choy Wah Louie
Represented By: George Martin Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A Dubbs
Represented By: Susan Tayeko Kumagai
Represented By: Gary T. Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?