Arista Music et al v. Radionomy, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC and Sony Music Entertainment
Defendant: Radionomy, Inc., Radionomy SA, Radionomy Group, B.V. and Alexandre Saboundjian
Case Number: 3:2016cv00951
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Standstill Agreement and Adjustment of Case Schedule. Jury Selection/Trial set for 2/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
October 27, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/27/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
July 8, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 54 Scheduling Order Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 23, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 50 Selecting ADR Process. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/23/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 8, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying without prejudice defendants' motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and granting plaintiffs' request to conduct limited discovery. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 37 Regarding Consolidated Opposition Brief of Plaintiffs in Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/20/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
April 5, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 26 for Extension of Time for Defendants Radionomy Inc., Radionomy S.A., and Radionomy Group B.V. To Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arista Music et al v. Radionomy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Music
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Scott Christensen Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Records LLC
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Scott Christensen Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaFace Records, LLC
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Scott Christensen Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Scott Christensen Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zomba Recording LLC
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Scott Christensen Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: Scott Christensen Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radionomy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radionomy SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radionomy Group, B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandre Saboundjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?