Monachelli v. Hortonworks, Inc, et al

Plaintiff: William Monachelli
Defendant: Hortonworks, Inc, Robert G Bearden and Scott J Davidson
Case Number: 3:2016cv00980
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR STATUS UPDATES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
December 5, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 43 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
June 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Robert G Bearden, Hortonworks, Inc, Scott J Davidson. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/22/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 1, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL 20 24 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
April 27, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Robert G Bearden, Hortonworks, Inc, Scott J Davidson. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/16 is continued to 9/16/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/27/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monachelli v. Hortonworks, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Monachelli
Represented By: J Alexander Hood
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Tuccillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hortonworks, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?