Evans et al v. Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Etopia Evans, Robert Massey, Troy Sadowski, Christopher Goode, Darryl Ashmore, Jerry Wunsch, Eric King, Alphonso Carreker, Steven Lofton, Duriel Harris, Mel Renfro, Cedric Killings and Jeffrey Graham
Defendant: Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills Inc., Panthers Football, LLC, The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club LTD., PDB Sports, Ltd, The Detroit Lions, Inc.,, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, LLC, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc, Miami Dolphins LTD, Minnesota Vikings Football Club, LLC, New England Patriots, LLC, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, The Oakland Raiders, LLP, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers, LLC, The St. Louis Rams LLC, Chargers Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners Football Company LLC, Football Northwest LLC, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Tennessee Football, Inc., Pro-Football Inc and NFL Clubs
Case Number: 3:2016cv01030
Filed: March 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER RE 243 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/26/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING 231 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING 212 MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 6/1/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION by Hon. William Alsup granting 214 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER DENYING 176 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER DENYING 171 EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 139 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup. Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2017. Motions due by 3/15/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING 161 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MARLA AXELROD PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING 159 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING 154 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JENNIFER HOLMES PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING 149 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR OPPOSITION BRIEF by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING 146 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW SLUTKIN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING 143 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE TIME TO 139 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 1/4/2017. Replies due by 1/11/2017. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING 137 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY NATHAN OLESON PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE 125 PLAINTIFFS' FIRST DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER RE 123 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 116 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRIAN W. CASTELLO PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING 113 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DEREK LUDWIN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING 110 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LAURA M. FLAHIVE WU PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING 108 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING 104 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JODI L. AVERGUN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING 102 PRO HAC VICE AS TO STEPHEN G. GRYGIEL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/26/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 96 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AS TO JANINE D. ARNO.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 76 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ALEXANDER WILLIAMS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE HEARING ON RENOTICED MOTION TO DISMISS Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 44 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/16/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etopia Evans
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Massey
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Sadowski
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Goode
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Ashmore
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wunsch
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric King
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Carreker
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lofton
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duriel Harris
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel Renfro
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Killings
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Graham
Represented By: Phillip J. Closius
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Mel T Owens
Represented By: Steven Donald Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew C White
Represented By: Alexander Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Bills Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panthers Football, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Bengals, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Cowboys Football Club LTD.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDB Sports, Ltd
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Detroit Lions, Inc.,
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Bay Packers, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Holdings, LP
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indianapolis Colts, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Jaguars, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Dolphins LTD
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Vikings Football Club, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Patriots, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Football Giants, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Jets LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Oakland Raiders, LLP
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Eagles, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburgh Steelers, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The St. Louis Rams LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chargers Football Company, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forty Niners Football Company LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Football Northwest LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buccaneers Limited Partnership
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Football, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro-Football Inc
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Clubs
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Represented By: Rebecca Ariel Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?