Tom v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Arlene Tom
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv01067
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER RE 152 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/28/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RE PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/30/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RE 54 SECOND DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 2/23/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016).
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING 26 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE ERISA PREEMPTION AND CONTINUING BENCH TRIAL (pursuant to 78 stipulation). Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/8/2016. Bench Trial set for 1/30/2017 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING 59 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DEFENDANT'S THIRD DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/2016. Meet-and-confer set for 11/23/2016 from 08:00 AM to noon. Discovery Hearing set for 11/23/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE 42 FIRST DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 46 REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE MEET AND CONFER AND HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER DISCOVERY AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Replies due by 11/10/2016. Responses due by 11/3/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 10/12/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/28/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/13/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tom v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Tom
Represented By: Constantin Vincent Roboostoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?