IMC Investment Group FE Winery, LLC v. Fairwinds Estate, LLC et al

Plaintiff: IMC Investment Group FE Winery, LLC
Defendant: Fairwinds Estate, LLC, Criswell Radovan, LLC, Robert Radovan, William Criswell, Lisa Pacey and Heather Hill
Case Number: 3:2016cv01134
Filed: March 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 8, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement due by 2:00 p.m. 6/9/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
April 14, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR REPLY BRIEFS RE APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND VACATING DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF NAMES AND POWERS OF RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
March 23, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting a Hearing Date on a Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by IMC Investment Group FE Winery, LLC, 23 Ex Parte MOTION for TRO and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed by Criswell Radovan, LLC, Robert Radovan, Fairwinds Estate, LLC, Heather Hill, Lisa Pacey, William Criswell. Various status reports due by 3/24/2016, 3/25/2016, 3/29/2016, and 4/15/2016. Discovery due by 3/25/20 16. Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 3/29/2016. Response and Cross Motion due by 4/1/2016. Response/Reply due by 4/5/2016. Reply due by 4/8/2016. Brief re Receiver/Special Master due by 3/30/2016. Response due by 4/4/2016. Mediation to be completed by 4/15/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 23, 2016. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 17, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' AND COUNTERCLAIMANTS' 23 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR SERVICE, BRIEFING, AND HEARING OF APPLICATION; AND QUESTION TO PARTIES. Responses due by 2:00 P.M. 3/21/ 2016. Replies due by 2:00 P.M. 3/22/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/17/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016) Modified on 3/17/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Proof of Service and Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Proof of Service due by 3/17/2016 at 2:19 p.m. Responses due by 3/21/2016 at 2:00 p.m. Reply due by 3/22/2016 at 2:00 p.m. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 03/16/2016. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMC Investment Group FE Winery, LLC v. Fairwinds Estate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMC Investment Group FE Winery, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Konrad Losch
Represented By: Mark Russell Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairwinds Estate, LLC
Represented By: Susan Scott Davis
Represented By: Ali Pasha Hamidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criswell Radovan, LLC
Represented By: Susan Scott Davis
Represented By: Ali Pasha Hamidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Radovan
Represented By: Susan Scott Davis
Represented By: Ali Pasha Hamidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Criswell
Represented By: Susan Scott Davis
Represented By: Ali Pasha Hamidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Pacey
Represented By: Susan Scott Davis
Represented By: Ali Pasha Hamidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Hill
Represented By: Susan Scott Davis
Represented By: Ali Pasha Hamidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?