Dolce v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kathleen Dolce
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv01142
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER For Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
September 23, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/8/2016 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Bench Trial set for 2/23/2017 at 01:30 PM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/23/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
May 3, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolce v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Dolce
Represented By: Paul Randall Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?