Buster v. Mechanics Bank Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan et al

Plaintiff: Steven K Buster
Defendant: Mechanics Bank Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan, Mechanics Bank and Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Mechanics Bank
Case Number: 3:2016cv01146
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 150 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS, AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
July 14, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 127 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND SETTING FORTH FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
May 24, 2017 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/24/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 18, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/18/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
November 17, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 69 84 MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/17/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 16, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 91 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
September 13, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO ADJUST SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 74 Administrative Motion.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
August 26, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup denying 48 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
June 21, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 8/25/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/21/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 20, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO CONDUCT COURT-ORDERED DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF STEVEN BUSTER AND DIANNE FELTON OF MECHANICS BANK by Hon. William Alsup granting 45 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 10, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/10/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 9, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 38 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 2, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 23 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 27, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/27/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 18, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR RESPONSE AND REPLY PAPERS RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/27/2016. Replies due by 6/10/2016. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/18/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
April 11, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court (DUPLICATE FILING - DISREGARD) SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016) Modified on 4/11/2016 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buster v. Mechanics Bank Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mechanics Bank Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan
Represented By: R. Bradford Huss
Represented By: Sean T. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mechanics Bank
Represented By: R. Bradford Huss
Represented By: Sean T. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Mechanics Bank
Represented By: R. Bradford Huss
Represented By: Sean T. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven K Buster
Represented By: Charles Michael Louderback
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?