B & R Supermarket, Inc., et al v. Visa, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B & R Supermarket, Inc. and Grove Liquors LLC
Defendant: Visa, Inc., Visa USA, Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated, American Express Company, Discover Financial Services, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Capital One Financial Corporation, Chase Bank USA, National Association, Citibank (South Dakota), N.A., Citibank, N.A., PNC Bank, National Association, USAA Savings Bank, U.S. Bancorp National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., EMVCo, LLC, JCB Co. Ltd and UnionPay
Case Number: 3:2016cv01150
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER GRANTING 437 MOTION TO TRANSFER by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER RE 436 445 449 452 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH 437 MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/7/2017. Show Cause Response due by 4/13/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER DENYING 443 LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/3/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER GRANTING 405 LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/9/2017. Motion due by 3/27/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Discovery Order re 401 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/1/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER GRANTING 398 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW EISENSTEIN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER GRANTING 388 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ISSUE LETTER ROGATORY AND APPOINT COMMISSIONER by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER GRANTING 392 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHELLE PARIKH PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER RE 388 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ISSUE LETTER ROGATORY AND APPOINT COMMISSIONER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/7/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER GRANTING 383 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EVA COLE PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER RE 357 360 PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER GRANTING 362 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAMARIS HERNANDEZ PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING 352 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/18/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE 347 by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS; (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO INTERVENE; (3) DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge William Alsup 290 301 303 308 . (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER APPROVING 310 STIPULATION REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER REGARDING LETTER FROM PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/26/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER RE REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/19/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER GRANTING 298 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ADRIENNE J. LIGHTEN.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER GRANTING 296 STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER APPROVING 264 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING 229 MOTION TO TRANSFER 256 256 . (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 QUESTIONS FOR JUNE 23 HEARING. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/21/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER RE MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 232 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 227 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 224 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 195 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 186 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER RE ADR DEADLINES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/31/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 166 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 152 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 137 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 43 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE LAW FIRM PLAN FOR IN COURT OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS Responses due by 4/14/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/17/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING 10 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ADVANCING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/14/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B & R Supermarket, Inc., et al v. Visa, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & R Supermarket, Inc.
Represented By: Randi D. Bandman
Represented By: Alexandra Senya Bernay
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Represented By: John William Devine
Represented By: Lawrence Dean Goodman
Represented By: Robert J Kuntz, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Medici
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Armen Zohrabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grove Liquors LLC
Represented By: Randi D. Bandman
Represented By: Alexandra Senya Bernay
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Medici
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Armen Zohrabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa, Inc.
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Mark R Merley
Represented By: Karen C Otto
Represented By: Robert John Vizas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa USA, Inc.
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Mark R Merley
Represented By: Karen C Otto
Represented By: Robert John Vizas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated
Represented By: Craig A Benson
Represented By: Kenneth A. Gallo
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Galvin
Represented By: Stephen E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Lauren Kelley Ross
Represented By: Rowan D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Elizabeth P Papez
Represented By: Jeanifer Ellen Parsigian
Represented By: Robert Yale Sperling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tiffani B Figueroa
Represented By: Natalie Anne Fleming Nolen
Represented By: Mark P. Ladner
Represented By: Alexandra Eve Laks
Represented By: Michael B. Miller
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Represented By: Mikael A. Abye
Represented By: Brian Calandra
Represented By: Benjamin Klebanoff
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Represented By: James Patrick Tallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: D. Bruce Hoffman
Represented By: Susan S. Joo
Represented By: Leslie Kostyshak
Represented By: Ryan A Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Represented By: Peter E Greene
Represented By: Raoul Dion Kennedy
Represented By: Harry P Koulos
Represented By: Evan R Kreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.
Represented By: Melissa Colon-Bosolet
Represented By: David F. Graham
Represented By: Peter K. Huston
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Nagin
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Melissa Colon-Bosolet
Represented By: David F. Graham
Represented By: Peter K. Huston
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Nagin
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Scott D. Baker
Represented By: Daniel I Booker
Represented By: Michelle Ann Mantine
Represented By: Conor Michael Shaffer
Represented By: Ashley Lynn Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Represented By: Ethan Craig
Represented By: Bradley Robert Love
Represented By: Kendall Millard
Represented By: Alicia M Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp National Association
Represented By: Andrew Baldwin Brantingham
Represented By: Martha Corcoran Luemers
Represented By: Angela Maryssa Porter
Represented By: Frederick Matthew Ralph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Howard Feller
Represented By: J. Brent Justus
Represented By: Casey Erin Lucier
Represented By: David Carlyle Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMVCo, LLC
Represented By: Dennis Francis Murphy
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCB Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnionPay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?