Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc. v. PB&A, Inc.

Plaintiff: Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc.
Defendant: PB&A, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01152
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2017 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/09/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 4, 2017 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PB&A'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BALFOUR BEATTY'S CONTRACT CLAIMS AND GRANTING PB&A'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY RE PB&A'S COUNTER-CLAIM re 109 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
March 31, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 124 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 4/10/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 13, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART NON-PARTY 74 URS'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Hon. William H. Orrick. PB&A shall reimburse URS for its travel costs resulting from the cancelled Brokken deposition of $383.46 within thirty days of the date of this Order. The remainder of URSs motion is DENIED.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
October 6, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND DENYING 32 MOTION TO QUASH by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
June 9, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/09/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc. v. PB&A, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PB&A, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?