Manger v. Leapfrog Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Pete J. Manger
Defendant: Leapfrog Enterprises, Inc., John Barbour, William B. Chiasson, Thomas J. Kalinske, E. Santon Mckee, Randy O Rissman, Caden Wang and Stephen M. Youngwood
Case Number: 3:2016cv01161
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 45 MOTION TO DISMISS. Having been given an opportunity to adequately plead the elements of his Section 14(e) claim, and having been unable to do so through three amendments, Manger's Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/09/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
January 23, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Section 14(d) claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's Section 14(e) and Section 20(a) claims are DISMISSED with leave to amend. If plaintiff believes he can amend to cure the deficiencies identified, he must file his Second Amended Complaint within twenty one (21) days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
May 10, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Response Deadline Pending Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Vacating Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/10/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
March 16, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Manger's motion for expedited discovery is DENIED. Motion Hearing as to preliminary injunction set for 3/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Franci sco before Hon. William H. Orrick. The parties shall agree upon an expedited briefing schedule that is concluded with a filing by 9 a.m., Pacific Standard Time, on March 28, 2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manger v. Leapfrog Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete J. Manger
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Barbara Ann Rohr
Represented By: James M. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leapfrog Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Barbour
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Chiasson
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Kalinske
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Santon Mckee
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy O Rissman
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caden Wang
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Youngwood
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?