Munguia-Brown et al v. Equity Residential et al

Plaintiff: Javanni Munguia-Brown, Angelina Magana and Norma Rodriguez
Defendant: Equity Residential, ERP Operating Limited Partnership, Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation, Equity Residential Management, LLC, EQR-Woodland Park A Limited Partnership and EQR-Woodland Park B Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2016cv01225
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/6/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 20, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re Five Discovery Letter Briefs (Dkt. Nos. 52, 52, 54, 55 and 56). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/20/2017. Discovery Order, Motions terminated: 54 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute Issue No. 3 o f 5: Interrogatory Identifying All Individuals with Knowledge of PwC Report filed by Equity Residential, Javanni Munguia-Brown, David Bonfanti, EQR-Woodland Park A Limited Partnership, Norma Rodriguez, ERP Operating Limited Partnership, Angelina Magana, Equity Residential Management, LLC, EQR-Woodland Park B Limited Partnership, 55 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute Issue No. 4 of 5: Redactions filed by Equity Residential, Javanni Munguia-Brown, Dav id Bonfanti, EQR-Woodland Park A Limited Partnership, Norma Rodriguez, ERP Operating Limited Partnership, Angelina Magana, EQR-Woodland Park B Limited Partnership, Equity Residential Management, LLC, 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute Issue No. 5 of 5: Costs Information filed by Equity Residential, Javanni Munguia-Brown, David Bonfanti, EQR-Woodland Park A Limited Partnership, Norma Rodriguez, ERP Operating Limited Partnership, Angelina Magana, EQR-Woodland Park B Limited Partnership, Equity Residential Management, LLC, 53 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute Issue No. 2 of 5: Draft Budgets with Projected Costs and Revenues filed by Equity Residential, Javanni Munguia-Brown, David Bonfanti, EQR-Woodland Park A Limited Partnership, Norma Rodriguez, ERP Operating Limited Partnership, Angelina Magana, EQR-Woodland Park B Limited Partnership, Equity Residential Management, LLC, 52 Joint Discover y Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute Issue No. 1 of 5: Email Searches filed by Equity Residential, Javanni Munguia-Brown, David Bonfanti, EQR-Woodland Park A Limited Partnership, Norma Rodriguez, ERP Operating Limited Partnership, Angelina Magana, EQR-Woodland Park B Limited Partnership, Equity Residential Management, LLC.(mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
May 26, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 11 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
March 24, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT:Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/24/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munguia-Brown et al v. Equity Residential et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javanni Munguia-Brown
Represented By: Linda Mary Dardarian
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: Megan E. Ryan
Represented By: Jason Holland Tarricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Magana
Represented By: Linda Mary Dardarian
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: Megan E. Ryan
Represented By: Jason Holland Tarricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Rodriguez
Represented By: Linda Mary Dardarian
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: Megan E. Ryan
Represented By: Jason Holland Tarricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Residential
Represented By: Christopher J. Healey
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERP Operating Limited Partnership
Represented By: Christopher J. Healey
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Healey
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Residential Management, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQR-Woodland Park A Limited Partnership
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQR-Woodland Park B Limited Partnership
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?