Lopez-Velazquez v. Johnson et al

Petitioner: Juan Carlos Lopez-Velazquez
Respondent: Jeh Johnson, Sarah Saldana, Thomas Homan, Adrian Macias, Steven L. Durfor and Loretta E. Lynch
Case Number: 3:2016cv01226
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 17 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss; and Denying 24 Petitioner's Motion for TRO. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Petitioner's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Any response must be filed by July 21, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. PST. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
March 21, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 5/20/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/21/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Velazquez v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Lopez-Velazquez
Represented By: Kevin Michael Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Siu Ping Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sarah Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adrian Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven L. Durfor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loretta E. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?