Carter et al v. XPO Logistics, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ron Carter, Juan Estrada, Jerry Green, Burl Malmgren, Bill McDonald and Joel Morales
Defendant: XPO Logistices, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv01231
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 128 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
December 20, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response by plaintiff counsel in Case 3:16cv739 due by 12/22/2016. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
October 3, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Conditional Certification by Hon. William H. Orrick re 49 Motion to Certify Class. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
August 23, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND ORDER TO FACILITATE COLLECTIVE ACTION NOTICE - Reset Deadlines as to 49 MOTION to Certify Class. Response due by 8/31/2016. Reply due by 9/14/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 18, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. XPO Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Carter
Represented By: Amy Sayoko Endo
Represented By: Jennifer Grace Keating
Represented By: Beth A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Estrada
Represented By: Amy Sayoko Endo
Represented By: Jennifer Grace Keating
Represented By: Beth A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Green
Represented By: Amy Sayoko Endo
Represented By: Jennifer Grace Keating
Represented By: Beth A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burl Malmgren
Represented By: Amy Sayoko Endo
Represented By: Jennifer Grace Keating
Represented By: Beth A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill McDonald
Represented By: Amy Sayoko Endo
Represented By: Jennifer Grace Keating
Represented By: Beth A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Morales
Represented By: Amy Sayoko Endo
Represented By: Jennifer Grace Keating
Represented By: Beth A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistices, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?