Westport Insurance Corporation v. California Casualty Management Co.

Plaintiff: Westport Insurance Corporation
Defendant: California Casualty Management Co.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01246
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 82 Motion. (Hearing set for May 31, 2017 is VACATED.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
April 7, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WESTPORT'S 67 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING CALIFORNIA CASUALTY'S 61 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/07/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
December 21, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/21/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
July 8, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
May 26, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. If plaintiff wishes to file a second reply brief addressing any new arguments raised in defendant's second opposition brief, it may do so by June 1, 2016. Case Management Conference rescheduled for 6/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/26/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
March 14, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting defendant's 23 Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Northern District of California. Further, plaintiff's 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings remains pending and will be decided by the California court. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/14/2016. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westport Insurance Corporation v. California Casualty Management Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westport Insurance Corporation
Represented By: William Clayton Crawford, Jr.
Represented By: Adam H. Fleischer
Represented By: Grant D. Henderson
Represented By: Michael Kenneth Johnson
Represented By: Michael H. Passman
Represented By: Mark G Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Casualty Management Co.
Represented By: Mark G. Bonino
Represented By: Mark Giovanni Bonino
Represented By: Derek H. Mackay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?