PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. International Business Machines Corporation

Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC and Level 3 Communications LLC
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Mediator: David Folsom
Consol_defendant: Github Inc.
Miscellaneous: David Keyzer
Case Number: 3:2016cv01266
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 379 Opinion or Order of the Court UNSEALED ORDER DENYING 364 IBM'S RENEWED MOTION TO EXCLUDE/STRIKE THE OPINIONS OF DR. MICHAEL AKEMANN. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/7/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 7, 2017 369 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 365 367 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/7/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 31, 2017 355 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 353 IBM'S MOTION TO VACATE ORDER OF JULY 28, 2017, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO RE-SET SECHEDULES, AND FOR CONTINUED TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/31/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 28, 2017 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/28/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 27, 2017 347 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 273 286 287 289 309 316 319 322 324 325 334 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/27/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 26, 2017 345 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER REGARDING 269 279 285 313 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/26/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 25, 2017 343 Opinion or Order of the Court FIRST ORDER REGARDING 255 270 271 275 278 280 281 282 283 284 288 317 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/25/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
May 31, 2017 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 250 IBM'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON PERSONALWEB'S INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT THEORIES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/31/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 18, 2017 249 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED ORDER DENYING 212 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 218 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 9, 2017 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 233 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
February 13, 2017 210 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY) - SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFIC DEADLINES: The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 2/23/2017 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the order. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due by 7/6/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 8/8/2017 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 8/8/2017 01:30 PM. Jury Trial dates:8/9, 8/11, 8/15, 8/16, 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/13/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2016 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 128 Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination; denying 161 Administrative Motion for Continuance of the Hearing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/9/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Alan P. Block
Represented By: Roderick G. Dorman
Represented By: Lawrence M. Hadley
Represented By: Phillip Jeung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications LLC
Represented By: David Dewey Wier, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth R. Adamo
Represented By: Michael I Cohen
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Cutri
Represented By: Ryan Mark Hubbard
Represented By: Brent P. Ray
Represented By: Archit Pradip Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: David Folsom
Represented By: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Github Inc.
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Represented By: Ryan M. Kent
Represented By: Brent P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?